Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2830001 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2830001



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 78
15.12.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
10.12.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
27.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
25.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
25.06.2014 Description Search / examination 16
25.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
25.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4