Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2830001


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.12.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
03.09.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
28.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]