Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823989

EP2823989 - Add-on communication apparatus attached to cable installment type charging control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.06.2018  [2018/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
127 LS-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Choi, Seung Woo
c/o LSIS CO., LTD.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date14174081.126.06.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateKR2013008074510.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130080745
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2823989
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2823989
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60L11/18
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:An eine Ladesteuerungsvorrichtung vom Kabelinstallationstyp angebrachte Zusatz-Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2015/03]
English:Add-on communication apparatus attached to cable installment type charging control device[2015/03]
French:Appareil de communication complémentaire fixé à un dispositif de commande de charge monté sur câble[2015/03]
Examination procedure22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
19.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010022059  (AUSTIN CHRISTOPHER B [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0080]; figure 15 *;
 [I]US2011172839  (BROWN KENNETH J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0186] - [0188]; figures 51-52 *;
 [I]US2010306033  (OVED DROR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] - [0069] - [0071]; figures 2,10 *;
 [I]JP2010110051  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046]; figures 1,2,7,8 *;
 [I]EP2455924  (TELIASONERA AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *;
 [I]JP2011250617  (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0039]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2012109798  (SHELTON JOHN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0257] - [0263]; figure 21 *;
 [I]US2010174667  (VITALE ROBERT L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figures 2-5 *