EP2818573 - Coated cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Östlund, Åke Terrängvägen 96 129 47 Hägersten / SE | 02 /
Edman, Jonny Fjärilstigen 78 144 42 Rönninge / SE | 03 /
Lindahl, Erik Ringgatan 2A 752 17 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
Engqvist, Jan Eriksgatan 26C 752 18 Uppsala / SE | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14174143.9 | 26.06.2014 | [2015/01] | Priority number, date | EP20130174011 | 27.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13174011 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818573 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2818573 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C23C16/40, C23C16/02, C23C16/36, C23C16/56, B23B27/14, C23C30/00 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
C23C16/0254 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C14/06 (BR);
B23B27/148 (BR,KR,US);
B23B27/14 (RU);
C23C14/081 (BR);
C23C16/0272 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
C23C16/36 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C23C16/40 (RU);
C23C16/403 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
C23C16/44 (RU);
C23C16/56 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
C23C30/00 (BR);
C23C30/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23B2200/00 (US);
B23B2224/04 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | C23C14/08, C23C16/40, C23C16/02, C23C16/36, C23C16/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Beschichtetes Schneidewerkzeug | [2015/01] | English: | Coated cutting tool | [2015/01] | French: | Outil de coupe revêtu | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/50] | 12.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.10.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/08] | Appeal following opposition | 23.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1249/19 | 08.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2014 | AL | 03.02.2016 | AT | 03.02.2016 | BE | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | IE | 26.06.2016 | LU | 26.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2570510 (WALTER AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * example 1 * | by applicant | EP1953258 | WO2013037997 | - BIRKHOLZ, Thin Film Analysis by X-ray Scattering, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, (2006), pages 211 - 215 | Opposition | JP2008093769 | EP2604720 | JPH08132130 | WO2013037997 | WO2013037998 | JP2005264194 | WO2013031952 | EP1479791 | US2012015148 | EP1905870 | EP1696051 | - S. RUPPI., "Enhanced performance of alpha-A1203 coatings by control of crystal orientation.", Surface & Coatings Technology, (20080000), vol. 202, no. 17, pages 4257 - 4269, XP022663878 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2008.03.021 | - T. SHIRAI et al., "Structural Properties and Surface Characteristics on Aluminum Oxide Powders.", Annual report of the Ceramics Research Laboratory, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 23 - 31, XP055323284 | - "Tiger-Tec® Silver - ISO P Generation. Product handbook", WALTER Tools, pages 1 - 60, XP055323379 | - "Product innovations - _TOOL INNOVATIONS IN TURNING", WALTER Tools, (20110200), pages 1 - 19, XP055323383 | - M. MASIMOV et al., "Analysis of Dislocation - Induced Lattice Misorientations in Distorted Crystals by X-ray Diffraction and EBSD.", Proceedings of the XIX conference. Applied Crystallography., Singapore ., (20040000), pages 35 - 39, XP055323471 | - SCOTT A. SPEAKMAN, "Introduction to High Resolution X-Ray Diffraction of Epitaxial Thin Films''.", MIT Center for Materials Science and Engineering, (20160000), pages 1 - 53, URL: http://prism.mit.edu/xray., XP055323478 | - X ZHAO et al., "Crystal Quality Measurement on Niobium Materials'' .", Presentation at the 5th SRF Thin Film Workshop, JLab., (20120000), pages 1 - 47, XP055323488 |