EP2821935 - Vehicle detection method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
He, Na c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044 Beijing / CN | 02 /
Hu, Ping c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044 Beijing / CN | 03 /
Shi, Zhongchao c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044 Beijing / CN | 04 /
Lu, Yaojie c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044 Beijing / CN | 05 /
Wang, Gang c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168, Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044 Beijing / CN | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/48] |
Former [2015/02] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14174203.1 | 26.06.2014 | [2015/02] | Priority number, date | CN201310271915 | 01.07.2013 Original published format: CN201310271915 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2821935 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2821935 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821935 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G06T7/00 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/68 (EP);
G06V10/451 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/10021 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP);
G06T2207/30252 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fahrzeugerfassung und Vorrichtung | [2015/02] | English: | Vehicle detection method and device | [2015/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection de véhicule | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 11.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2014 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 26.06.2020 | LU | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7227893 (SRINIVASA NARAYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 20 - column 21 *; | [A] - BROGGI A ET AL, "Multi-resolution vehicle detection using artificial vision", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 2004 IEEE PARMA, ITALY JUNE 14-17, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040614), doi:10.1109/IVS.2004.1336400, ISBN 978-0-7803-8310-4, pages 310 - 314, XP010727487 [A] 1-10 * page 311 - page 312 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2004.1336400 | [A] - KUEHNLE A ED - CALDERARA SIMONE ET AL, "SYMMETRY-BASED RECOGNITION OF VEHICLE REARS", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0167-8655(91)90039-O, ISSN 0167-8655, (19910401), pages 249 - 258, (20040825), XP008107374 [A] 1-10 * page 251 - page 254 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8655(91)90039-O | [A] - CHUNG-HEE LEE, "Stereo vision-based vehicle detection using a road feature and disparity histogram", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (20110201), vol. 50, no. 2, doi:10.1117/1.3535590, ISSN 0091-3286, page 027004, XP055049146 [A] 1-10 * pages 4, 7 - page 9; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.3535590 | by applicant | US6842531 | US2009110286 |