Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818474

EP2818474 - Aza-polysilane precursors and methods for depositing films comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Versum Materials US, LLC
8555 River Parkway
Tempe, AZ 85284 / US
[2017/38]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Xiao, Manchao
5534 Caballos Place
San Diego, CA California 92130 / US
02 / Lei, Xinjian
1928 Cherrywood
Vista, CA California 92081 / US
03 / Spence, Daniel P.
2334 Hosp Way No. 311
Carlsbad, CA California 92008 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date14174252.826.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS201361839536P26.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361839536 P
US20141429355402.06.2014         Original published format: US201414293554
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818474
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07F7/10, C01B33/04, C23C16/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Aza-Polysilan-Vorläufer und Verfahren zur Ablagerung von Filmen damit[2015/01]
English:Aza-polysilane precursors and methods for depositing films comprising same[2015/01]
French:Précurseurs aza-polysilanes et procédé de dépôt de films les comportant[2015/01]
Examination procedure25.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
22.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1441042  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [I] 1-15 * pages 2,6 *
 [X]  - SOELDNER, MARCUS ET AL, "1,2-Disilanediyl Bis(triflate), F3CSO3-SiH2SiH2-O3SCF3, as the Key Intermediate for a Facile Preparation of Open-Chain and Cyclic 1,1- and 1,2-Diaminodisilanes", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY CODEN: INOCAJ, (1997), vol. 36, no. 9, doi:10.1021/IC961416+, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 1758 - 1763, XP002731887 [X] 1,3,4 * page 1761; compounds 4a,b *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC961416+
 [X]  - SOELDNER, MARCUS ET AL, "Binary Si/N-[4.4]-Spirocycles with Two SiH2SiH2 Loops", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY CODEN: INOCAJ, (1998), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1021/IC9711022, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 510 - 515, XP002731888 [X] 1,3,4 * page 514; compound 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC9711022
 [A]  - SOELDNER, MARCUS ET AL, "Isomeric Cyclic Disilanediyl Dimethylhydrazines", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY CODEN: INOCAJ, (1998), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1021/IC9709638, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 601 - 603, XP002731889 [A] 1-15 * page 602; compound 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC9709638
 [A]  - YOSHIOKA T ET AL, "Nuclear magnetic resonance coupling constant relation-ships in analogous ethyl, disilanyl, silymethyl, and methylsilyl compounds", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SPECTROSCOPY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 21, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/0022-2852(66)90125-1, ISSN 0022-2852, (19660101), pages 103 - 106, (19660101), XP023951968 [A] 1-15 * page 105; table II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2852(66)90125-1
by applicantUS5660895
 US7019159
 US7064083
 US8153832
 US2009209081
 US7077904
 US2013109155
 US7446217
 US7531679
 US7713346
 US7786320
 US7887883
 US7910765
    - SCHUH ET AL., "Disilanyl-amines - Compounds Comprising the Structure Unit Si-Si-N, as Single-Source Precursors for Plasma-Enhanced Chemical Vapor Deposition (PE-CVD) of Silicon Nitride", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR ANORGANISCHE UND ALLGEMEINE CHEMIE, (1993), vol. 619, pages 1347 - 52
    - S61DNER ET AL., "1,2-Disilanediyl Bis(triflate), F CSO -SiH -SiH -O SCF , as the Key Intermediate for a Facile Preparation of Open-Chain and Cyclic 1,1- and 1,2-Diaminodisilanes", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 1758 - 63
    - ABEDINI ET AL., "Proton magnetic resonance spectra and base strengths of disilanylamines", QUARTERLY BULLETIN OF THE FACULTY OF SCIENCE, vol. 3, no. 4, pages 1 - 6