Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824630

EP2824630 - Systems and methods for obtaining user feedback to media content [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Guangshun Gary
14200 Lutheria Way
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
02 / Guo, Shengbo
3200 Zanker Road
Apt. 1268
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
03 / Miller, Jeff
141 Pier Avenue
Pismo Beach, CA 93449 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date14174589.326.06.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateUS201361845313P11.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361845313 P
US20141417823311.02.2014         Original published format: US201414178233
KR2014005675912.05.2014         Original published format: KR 20140056759
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824630
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Benutzerfeedback auf Medieninhalte[2015/03]
English:Systems and methods for obtaining user feedback to media content[2015/03]
French:Systèmes et procédés permettant d'obtenir une rétroaction d'utilisateur pour un contenu multimédia[2015/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
03.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/33]
11.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/33]
Appeal following examination12.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0131/17
15.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03015056  (SCHMIDT EBERHARD [DE]; TEIWES WULF [DE]; VISUAL INTERACTION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-10,12-15;
 [I]EP2455905  (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *