blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2818526 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818526



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 194
26.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.07.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
29.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 16
29.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 24
29.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
02.12.2014 European search report Search / examination 4
17.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
27.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
27.06.2014 Description Search / examination 21
27.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
27.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5