blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2818526


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
15.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
28.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
02.07.2016 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2016 (Expected) grant published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
18.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
03.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - request for examination published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
01.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
30.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]