blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2818526 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410295621 EP14174709



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9305806Global Dossier 05.04.2016B2
US2015132956 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
US201514598472 16.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8974692Global Dossier 10.03.2015B2
US2015004788 01.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101651935BGlobal Dossier 29.08.2016B1
KR20150001678 06.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6023125BGlobal Dossier 09.11.2016B2
JP2015029083 12.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104250816BGlobal Dossier 23.06.2017B
CN104250816 31.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2818526Global Dossier 22.06.2016B1
EP2818526 31.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI507492B 11.11.2015B
TW201500493 01.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313929346 27.06.2013