Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818526

EP2818526 - Chemical mechanical polishing slurry compositions and method using the same for copper and through-silicon via applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Shi, Xiaobo
2431 W. Toledo Place
Chandler, AZ Arizona 85224 / US
02 / Murella, Krishna P.
15043 S. 47th Way
Phoenix, AZ Arizona 85044 / US
03 / Schlueter, James Allen
15837 S. 13th Avenue
Phoenix, AZ Arizona 85045 / US
04 / Choo, Jae Ouk
1673 E. Zion Way
Chandler, AZ Arizona 85249 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date14174709.727.06.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS20131392934627.06.2013         Original published format: US201313929346
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818526
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818526
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C09G1/02, H01L21/321, C09K3/14
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/01]C09G1/02, H01L21/321
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzung für chemisch-mechanisches Polieren und Verfahren damit für Kupfer- und Silicium-Durchkontaktierungsanwendungen[2015/01]
English:Chemical mechanical polishing slurry compositions and method using the same for copper and through-silicon via applications[2015/01]
French:Compositions de pâte de polissage chimique mécanique et procédé d'utilisation de celui-ci pour des applications d'interconnexion et de cuivre[2015/01]
Examination procedure29.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
19.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2016Fee for grant paid
13.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2014
AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU27.06.2014
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU27.06.2014
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2018/32]HU27.06.2014
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU27.06.2014
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
LU27.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/23]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
IE27.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/17]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2017/03]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009203566  (LEE WAI MUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1775337  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 3 *;
 [AD]EP1229093  (FUJIMI INC [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * example all; claim all *;
 [AD]US2010081279  (PALMER BENTLEY J [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * example all; claim all *;
 [A]US2002123224  (LEE JAE-DONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim all *;
 [A]US2005112894  (PARK JEONG-HEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 7-15 *;
 [A]US2004108302  (LIU JUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim all *;
 [A]US6546939  (SMALL ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 9-17 *;
 [A]WO03091376  (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 29, lines 10-15; claim 22 *;
 [A]WO2011047263  (PLANAR SOLUTIONS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example all; claim all *
by applicantUS6436811
 US5770095
 US6585568
 US6679929
 US6440186
 US6838016
 US2007167017
 US2009156006
 US2010081279