Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821148

EP2821148 - Device for cleaning of particles and filth from surfaces, particularly of panels designed for further processings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salvador, Luigino
Via Villanova, 12
31020 Sernaglia della Battaglia (TV) / IT
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Dalla Rosa, Adriano
SEBRINT
Via del Troi, 2
33170 Pordenone / IT
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date14175034.930.06.2014
[2015/02]
Priority number, dateIT2013PN0003802.07.2013         Original published format: IT PN20130038
[2015/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821148
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B08B1/00, B08B7/00
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Teilchen und Schmutz von Oberflächen, insbesondere von Platten für die weitere Signalverarbeitung[2015/02]
English:Device for cleaning of particles and filth from surfaces, particularly of panels designed for further processings[2015/02]
French:Dispositif pour nettoyage de particules et impuretés en surfaces, notamment des panneaux conçus pour des traitements ultérieurs[2015/02]
Examination procedure30.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
06.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
31.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/23]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
08.10.2015Request for further processing filed
08.10.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.10.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201603   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2016
30.06.201704   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2017
30.06.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2037037  (EQUITAN S R L [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0076] * * figure 2a * [Y] 2-5,10 [I] 6-9;
 [YA]WO2006051292  (TECHNIJET LTD [GB]; MACFARLANE DAVID WILLIAM [GB]) [Y] 2-5,10 * page 4, line 12 * * page 7, lines 13-21 * * page 8, lines 13-14 * * page 8, lines 30-32 * * page 10, lines 5-10 * * page 19, lines 14-20 * * page 21, lines 7-14 * * page 22, lines 18-23 * * page 23, lines 18-21 * * figure 2 * [A] 1,6-9;
 [A]US5953994  (SEEFRIED KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 42-44 * * figure 1 *