Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821563

EP2821563 - Mortar strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2017New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
30.06.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.08.2017  [2017/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pichler, Ekkehart
Ziegeleistraße 14
4082 Aschach / AT
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)KLIMENT & HENHAPEL
Patentanwälte OG
Gonzagagasse 15/2
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]KLIMENT & HENHAPEL
Patentanwälte OG Singerstrasse 8/3/9
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date14175362.402.07.2014
[2015/02]
Priority number, dateAT2013000056204.07.2013         Original published format: AT 5622013
[2015/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821563
Date:07.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:E04G21/20
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2015/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mörtelband[2015/02]
English:Mortar strip[2015/02]
French:Bande de mortier[2015/02]
Examination procedure18.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
18.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/31]
29.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2017
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XDYI]DE102004033945  (LEIPFINGER BADER KG [DE]) [XD] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 5;
 [XAYI]DE102004055693  (LEISNER CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; figure 3 * [A] 5 [Y] 2,3 [I] 4,6;
 [XAI]DE3327059  (QUANTE HEINRICH) [X] 1-4 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 2,4 * [A] 5 [I] 6;
 [XYI]EP0659951  (RENGSTL HORST [DE]) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 14 - line 55; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 5,6;
 [YD]DE10019264  (QUICK MIX GRUPPE GMBH & CO KG [DE]; WIENERBERGER ZIEGELIND [DE]) [YD] 2,3 * paragraph [0005]; figure 3 *;
 [AD]AT400604B  (BELETZ OSKAR) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantDE10019264
 DE102004033945
 AT400604B