Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824718

EP2824718 - Photovoltaic module and fabricating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
127 LS-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Won, Chang Sub
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-Gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Dong Chan
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Kang, Bo Ram
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Lee, Jin
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Waithiru, Lawrence
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date14175517.303.07.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateKR2013008169711.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130081697
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824718
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2824718
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/35]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fotovoltaisches Modul und Herstellungsverfahren[2015/03]
English:Photovoltaic module and fabricating method thereof[2015/03]
French:Module photovoltaïque et son procédé de fabrication[2015/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/35]
24.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2016Fee for grant paid
24.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.07.2014
AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2018/47]AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]KR20120078026  (SKC CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,6,8,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0042]; claims 1,4,5 * [I] 2-5,7,9-11,13,14;
 [Y]EP2117050  (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK [JP]) [Y] 1,6-8,12 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2010101582  (DU PONT [US]; ZHAO RUOFEI [CN]; WU QIUJU [CN]; REN SHIJIE [CN]; XU BO) [Y] 1,6-8,12 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [Y]KR20120121363  (YOUL CHON CHEMICAL CO. LTD.) [Y] 1,6-8,12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] *;
 [P]EP2704209  (YOUL CHON CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]US2011139224  (KRAJEWSKI TODD [US]) [A] 9 * claims 1,30 *