Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815766

EP2815766 - Compositions and methods for antibodies targeting complement protein C5 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Diefenbach-Streiber, Beate
Reiherweg 6
86949 Windach / DE
02 / Eberth, Adina
Friedrich-List Strasse 114
81377 München / DE
03 / Guild, Braydon Charles
109 Riverdale Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
04 / Kim, Yong-In
Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc.
500 Technology Square
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
05 / Roguska, Michael
Novartis Institutes for BioMedical
Research Inc.
500 Technology Square
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
06 / Splawski, Igor
Novartis Institutes for BioMedical
Research Inc.
500 Technology Square
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Wood, Jonathan Paul
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date14175571.003.08.2009
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateUS20080086355P05.08.2008         Original published format: US 86355 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815766
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815766
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/18
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesAL24.06.2015
BA24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren für auf das Komplementprotein C5 gerichtete Antikörper[2014/52]
English:Compositions and methods for antibodies targeting complement protein C5[2014/52]
French:Compositions et procédés pour des anticorps ciblant une protéine du complément C5[2014/52]
Examination procedure24.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
04.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2017Fee for grant paid
24.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09737379.9  / EP2328616
Opposition(s)06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2009
AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE03.08.2017
IT03.08.2017
LU03.08.2017
MT03.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE03.08.2017
IT03.08.2017
LU03.08.2017
MT03.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE03.08.2017
IT03.08.2017
LU03.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/34]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE03.08.2017
LU03.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006115476  (TEDESCO FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [X] 1-26,28 * examples 1-12 * [Y] 34,35;
 [XY]WO9529697  (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14,27,36-39 * examples 1-15 * [Y] 34,35;
 [XY]WO0230985  (TANOX INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * figure 2 * * examples 1-3 * [Y] 34,35;
 [Y]US2007196367  (DINU VALENTIN [US]) [Y] 34,35 * paragraphs [0061] - [0063] *;
 [X]WO02086085  (BAYER AG [US], et al) [X] 29-33 * sequence 115 * * paragraphs [0082] , [0083] , [0120] *
 [XY]  - CICCHETTI F ET AL, "Immune parameters relevant to neural xenograft survival in the primate brain", XENOTRANSPLANTATION, MUNKSGAARD, DE, (20030101), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 0908-665X, pages 41 - 49, XP002410883 [X] 1-5 * page 42 * * table 1 * * pages 44-46 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 34,35

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-3089.2003.01130.x
 [IY]  - ROTHER RUSSELL P ET AL, "Discovery and development of the complement inhibitor eculizumab for the treatment of paroxysmal nocturnal hemoglobinuria.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY NOV 2007, (200711), vol. 25, no. 11, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1256 - 1264, XP002553743 [I] 1-26,28 * the whole document * [Y] 34,35

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1344
 [A]  - HOLERS V MICHAEL, "The spectrum of complement alternative pathway-mediated diseases.", IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS JUN 2008, (200806), vol. 223, ISSN 1600-065X, pages 300 - 316, XP002553744 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-065X.2008.00641.x
by applicantUS6703199
 US5641870
 US5766886
 US5225539
 US5530101
 US5585089
 US5693762
 US6180370
 US6818418
 US2004175756
 US2005053973
 US2005048512
 US2006008844
 US5831012
 WO9916873
 WO0104144
 WO2004106368
 US2005008625
 US2003198971
 US2003157579
 WO9404678
 US5759808
 US2004161738
 US4946778
 US5260203
 US5455030
 US4881175
 US5132405
 US5091513
 US5476786
 US5013653
 US5258498
 US5482858
 EP1012280
 EP0154316
 EP0401384
 WO9823289
 WO9734631
 US6277375
 WO9315199
 WO9315200
 WO0177137
 EP0413622
 US5336603
 US5622929
 US5359046
 US5349053
 US5447851
 US5112946
 EP0307434
 EP0367166
 WO9604388
 WO9106570
 US5605793
 US5811238
 US5830721
 US5834252
 US5837458
 US4458066
 US4816567
 US5545806
 US5569825
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5789650
 US5877397
 US5661016
 US5814318
 US5874299
 US5770429
 US5545807
 WO9203918
 WO9312227
 WO9425585
 WO9713852
 WO9824884
 WO9945962
 WO0114424
 WO0243478
 US5939598
 US6075181
 US6114598
 US6150584
 US6162963
 US5223409
 US5403484
 US5571698
 US5427908
 US5580717
 US5969108
 US6172197
 US5885793
 US6521404
 US6544731
 US6555313
 US6582915
 US6593081
 US5476996
 US5698767
 US2003153043
 US5677425
 US6165745
 US5869046
 US6121022
 US5624821
 US5648260
 US6194551
 WO9429351
 WO0042072
 US5714350
 US6350861
 EP1176195
 WO03035835
 WO9954342
 US2005255552
 WO02092780
 WO03074679
 US6087120
 US5843449
 US6218368
 US5808109
 US2006067935
 WO0105950
 US6355245
    - MARZARI ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 32, pages 2773 - 2782
    - TRENDELENBURG, SWISS MED WKLY, (2007), vol. 137, pages 413 - 417
    - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - HOLLINGER; HUDSON, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1126 - 1136
    - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - MORRISON; OI, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 44, pages 65 - 92
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536
    - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUN., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498
    - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 31, pages 169 - 217
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1970), vol. 2, page 482C
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - GAP, BESTFIT, FASTA, AND TFASTA IN THE WISCONSIN GENETICS SOFTWARE PACKAGE
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915
    - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787
    - E. MEYERS; W. MILLER, COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL, BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453
    - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081
    - OHTSUKA E, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608
    - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J.MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10
    - RIECHMANN, L. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327
    - JONES, P. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - QUEEN, C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD., U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033
    - TOMLINSON, I. M. ET AL., J. FOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798
    - COX, J. P. L. ET AL., EUR. J IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 827 - 836
    - STIJLEMANS, B. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, pages 1256 - 1261
    - DUMOULIN, M. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 424, pages 783 - 788
    - PLESCHBERGER, M. ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (2003), vol. 14, pages 440 - 448
    - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO, V. ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2002), vol. 89, pages 456 - 62
    - LAUWEREYS, M. ET AL., EMBO J, (1998), vol. 17, pages 3512 - 3520
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJA ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - HOLLIGER; WINTER, CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1997), vol. 45, no. 3-4, pages 128 - 30
    - WU ET AL., IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 21 - 36
    - HOLLIGER; WINTER, CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1997), vol. 45, no. 34, pages 128 - 30
    - PLUCKTHUN; PACK, IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 83 - 105
    - RIDGWAY ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1996), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 617 - 21
    - LU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 4, pages 2856 - 65
    - KARPOVSKY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1984), vol. 160, page 1686
    - LIU, MA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 8648
    - PAULUS, BEHRING INS. MITT. NO. 78, (1985), pages 118 - 132
    - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83
    - GLENNIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 2367 - 2375
    - ASHKENAZI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10535 - 10539
    - ZHENG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5590 - 5600
    - VIL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11337 - 11341
    - PATTEN ET AL., CURR. OPINION BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 33
    - HARAYAMA, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 76 - 82
    - HANSSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 287, pages 265 - 76
    - LORENZO; BLASCO, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 308 - 313
    - GENTZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824
    - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767
    - DENARDO ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 2483 - 90
    - PETERSON ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 553 - 7
    - ZIMMERMAN ET AL., NUCL. MED. BIOL., (1999), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 943 - 50
    - ARNON ET AL., "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", ARNON ET AL., REISFELD ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 243 - 56
    - HELLSTROM ET AL., "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM ET AL., ROBINSON ET AL., Controlled Drug Delivery, 2nd ed., MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 623 - 53
    - THORPE ET AL., "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE ET AL., PINCHERA ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies 84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (1985), pages 475 - 506
    - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radiolabeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", BALDWIN ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 303 - 16
    - THORPE ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1982), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58
    - NARANG ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 90
    - BROWN ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 109
    - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRA. LETT., (1981), vol. 22, page 1859
    - MATTILA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 967
    - ECKERT ET AL., PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1991), vol. 1, page 17
    - HARRINGTON ET AL., NAT GENET, (1997), vol. 15, page 345
    - SMITH, ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 49, page 807
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, page 143
    - SCHARF ET AL., RESULTS PROBL. CELL DIFFER., (1994), vol. 20, page 125
    - BITTNER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, page 516
    - QUEEN ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1986), vol. 89, pages 49 - 68
    - ELLIOT; O'HARE, CELL, (1997), vol. 88, page 223
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, no. 6474, pages 856 - 859
    - LONBERG, N, Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, (1994), vol. 113, pages 49 - 101
    - LONBERG, N; HUSZAR, D., INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - HARDING, F.; LONBERG, N., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1995), vol. 764, pages 536 - 546
    - TAYLOR, L. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295
    - CHEN, J., INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 5, pages 647 - 656
    - TUAILLON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 94, pages 3720 - 3724
    - CHOI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1993), vol. 4, pages 117 - 123
    - CHEN, J. ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 821 - 830
    - TUAILLON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2912 - 2920
    - TAYLOR, L. ET AL., INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), pages 579 - 591
    - FISHWILD, D. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851
    - TOMIZUKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 722 - 727
    - KUROIWA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 20, pages 889 - 894
    - SHIELDS, R.L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEN., (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604
    - SHIELDS, R.L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740
    - UMANA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180
    - NEWELL ET AL., J LAB CLIN MED, (1982), vol. 100, pages 437 - 44
    - BAATRUP ET AL., ANN RHEUM DIS, (1992), vol. 51, pages 892 - 7
    - AUD ET AL., RHEUMATOL INT, (1990), vol. 10, pages 185 - 9
    - CHAIN ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1987), vol. 99, pages 221 - 8
    - FORSTROM ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 303, pages 627 - 629
    - HALLIDAY ET AL., Assessment of Immune Status by the Leukocyte Adherence Inhibition Test, ACADEMIC, (1982), pages 1 - 26
    - KOPPI ET AL., CELL. IMMUNOL., (1982), vol. 66, pages 394 - 406
    - DIJK ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1980), vol. 36, pages 29 - 39
    - MINH ET AL., CLIN LAB HAEMATOL., (1983), vol. 5, pages 23 - 34
    - TANAKA ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1986), vol. 86, pages 161 - 170
    - STAHLI ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1983), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253
    - KIRKLAND ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, pages 3614 - 3619
    - MOREL ET AL., MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 25, pages 7 - 15
    - CHEUNG ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1990), vol. 176, pages 546 - 552
    - MOLDENHAUER ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 32, pages 77 - 82
    - TAKADA ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1978), vol. 34, page 509
    - BECKER, L., BIOCHEM. BIOPHY. ACTA, (1967), vol. 147, page 289
    - CONROW, R. B. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1980), vol. 23, page 242
    - HANSCH, C.; YOSHIMOTO, M., J. MED. CHEM., (1974), vol. 17, page 1160
    - DECLERCQ, P. F. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1975), vol. 67, page 255
    - GLOVSKY, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1969), vol. 102, page 1
    - LAPIDUS, M.; TOMASCO, J. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (1981), vol. 3, page 137
    - BURGE, J. J ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1978), vol. 120, page 1625
    - MULLER-EBERHARD, H. J. ET AL., MULLER-EBERHARD, H. J. ET AL., BERLIN, R. D. ET AL., Molecular Basis of Biological Degradative Processes, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1978), page 65
    - VOGT, W. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1979), vol. 36, page 138
    - VOGT ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 36, page 138
    - COREY ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1982), vol. 104, page 5551
    - HONG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 122, page 2418
    - MIYAZAKI ET AL., MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1980), vol. 24, page 1091
    - BUMPERS ET AL., LAB. CLINC. MED., (1983), vol. 102, page 421
    - HONG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 127, pages 104 - 108
    - WEINBERG, WEINBERG, FOYE, W. O., Principles of Medicinal Chemistry, 2nd ed., LEA & FEBIGER, (1981), page 813
    - DJURA ET AL., AUST. J. CHEM., (1983), vol. 36, page 1057
    - SULLIVAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1981), vol. 37, page 979
    - HUGLI ET AL., IMMUNOASSAYS CLINICAL LABORATORY TECHNIQUES, (1980), pages 443 - 460
    - GORSKI ET AL., J IMMUNOL METH, (1981), vol. 47, pages 61 - 73
    - LINDER ET AL., J IMMUNOL METH, (1981), vol. 47, pages 49 - 59
    - BURGER ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 141, pages 553 - 558
    - CHENOWETH ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1981), vol. 304, pages 497 - 502
    - BHAKDI ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1983), vol. 737, pages 343 - 372
    - CHEN ET AL., GENE, (1994), vol. 139, pages 73 - 75
    - KREBS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 254, pages 67 - 84
    - VIRNEKAS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 5600 - 5607
    - RAUCHENBERGER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 38194 - 38205
    - CHEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 293, pages 865 - 881
    - SCHIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 263, pages 551 - 567
    - FRIGUET ET AL., J. IMMUNOL METHODS, (1985), vol. 77, pages 305 - 319
    - HAENEL ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2005), vol. 339, pages 182 - 184
    - EVANS ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 32, pages 1183 - 1195
    - THOMAS ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 33, pages 1389 - 1401
    - RINDER ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (1995), vol. 96, pages 1564 - 1572
 WO1997EP05897