Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2815766 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2815766



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1827
09.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.01.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 210
24.01.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 210
12.12.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
11.11.2016 Description Search / examination 5
11.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
15.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.09.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 210
15.09.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 210
27.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 137
27.07.2016 Description Search / examination 135
27.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
04.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.12.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.07.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
24.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
24.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.12.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.12.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 8
25.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 7
14.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 181
24.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.08.2014 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
03.07.2014 Description Search / examination 135
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 73
03.07.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
02.03.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 178