Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2815766


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
02.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
31.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.01.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.11.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.09.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.12.2015 First examination report
12.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - request for examination published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
26.06.2015 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
24.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid