Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2837388 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2837388



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 702
08.12.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
05.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
16.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
16.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
13.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 8
21.01.2015 European search report Search / examination 7
21.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 181
24.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 39
22.10.2014 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 2
22.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.10.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
03.07.2014 Description Search / examination 135
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 73
03.07.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
02.03.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 178