Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808909

EP2808909 - Semiconductor light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2017/20]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
Seoul Square 416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Hyun Kyong
301, Pyeongan Villa
7-14, Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu
137-140 Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Sun Kyung
2010-1305, SinLG 2-cha Village Apt
Sinbong-dong
Yongin-si
448-534 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Jang, Jun Ho
102-1502, Hyundai Hometown Apt Hogye2-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si
431-753 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14175657.707.05.2007
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2006004100608.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060041006
KR2007003741417.04.2007         Original published format: KR 20070037414
KR2007003741517.04.2007         Original published format: KR 20070037415
KR2007003741617.04.2007         Original published format: KR 20070037416
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808909
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/20, H01L33/40, // H01L33/00, H01L33/42
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2015/26]
Former [2014/49]DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:Lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung[2014/49]
English:Semiconductor light emitting device[2014/49]
French:Dispositif électroluminescent à semiconducteur[2014/49]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
10.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07107655.8  / EP1855327
EP11167036.0  / EP2362441
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005285132  (ORITA KENJI [JP]) [I] 1-4,7-14,16 * figures 1, 9-16B * * page 5, paragraph [0085] - page 9, paragraph [0129] *;
 [I]US2006043400  (ERCHAK ALEXEI A [US] ET AL) [I] 1-4,6,7,11-13,16 * figures 12, 91-115 * * page 10, paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0203] * * page 28, paragraph [0367] - page 30, paragraph [0390] *;
 [AP]WO2006131087  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]; HAERLE VOLKER [DE]; BADER STEFAN) [AP] 1-16 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph L - page 23, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3,5-7 *;
 [A]EP1577958  (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 34 - page 8, line 15 * * figures 2-12 *;
 [A]US2004016937  (KACHI TETSU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0141225
 US6495862