Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2827339

EP2827339 - Source grating, interferometer, and object information acquisition system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Genta
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Derham, Cassandra Virginie
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[2015/04]
Application number, filing date14176029.807.07.2014
[2015/04]
Priority number, dateJP2013014746816.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013147468
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2827339
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G21K1/02
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/35]
Former [2015/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Quellengitter, Interferometer und Objektinformationserfassungssystem[2015/04]
English:Source grating, interferometer, and object information acquisition system[2015/04]
French:Réseau-source, interféromètre et système d'acquisition d'informations d'objet[2015/04]
Examination procedure31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/35]
01.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/22]
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012052900  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,5,16 * page 7, lines 14-15; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2012002785  (KANEKO YASUHISA [JP]) [Y] 1,5,16 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5812629  (CLAUSER JOHN F [US]) [A] 1;
 [A]WO2009128550  (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1a *
by applicantWO2010050483
 WO2004058070
 JP2012005820
    PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (2010), vol. 105, page 248102,
    PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (2010), vol. 105, page 24810,