Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2966877

EP2966877 - Controller for controlling an electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GN Audio A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
[2017/16]
Former [2016/02]For all designated states
GN Netcom A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Kann, Peter Ulrik
c/o GN Netcom A/S
GN IPR
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
02 / Hauschultz, Lars Ivar
c/o GN Netcom A/S
GN IPR
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
 [2016/02]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2016/02]
Application number, filing date14176046.208.07.2014
[2016/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2966877
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2966877
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/10, G06F3/01
[2016/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2016/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuergerät zum Steuern einer elektronischen Vorrichtung[2016/02]
English:Controller for controlling an electronic device[2016/02]
French:Dispositif de commande pour dispositif électronique[2016/02]
Examination procedure17.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
16.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2017Fee for grant paid
06.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.07.2014
AT17.05.2017
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MK17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
MT08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU08.07.2014
AT17.05.2017
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
MT08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU08.07.2014
AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
MT08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2019/30]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
MT08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/43]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
MT08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/39]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
LU08.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/23]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
IE08.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US7925039  (GRIFFIN PAUL [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011109552  (YASUTAKE TAIZO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011140956  (HANGZHOU KIND TAO TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS8094673
 US8116503
 US2009257604
 EP2403270