Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796186

EP2796186 - Membrane with means for status monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Friedberger, Alois
Kirchweg 16
85667 Oberpframmern / DE
02 / Helwig, Andreas
Fraunhoferstraße 9
80469 München / DE
03 / Müller, Gerhard
Sudetenstraße 126
85567 Grafing / DE
 [2019/32]
Former [2015/03]01 / Friedberger, Alois
Kirchweg 16
85667 Oberpframmern / DE
02 / Helwig, Andreas
Fraunhoferstraße 9
80467 München / DE
03 / Müller, Gerhard
Sudetenstraße 126
85567 Grafing / DE
Former [2014/45]01 / Friedberger, Alois
Am Stierberg 50
85667 Oberpframmern / DE
02 / Helwig, Andreas
Fraunhoferstraße 9
80467 München / DE
03 / Müller, Gerhard
Sudetenstraße 126
85567 Grafing / DE
Representative(s)Bird & Bird LLP
Großer Grasbrook 9
20457 Hamburg / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/44]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14176215.319.05.2010
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateDE2009102291327.05.2009         Original published format: DE102009022913
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796186
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796186
Date:07.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01D69/02, B01D67/00, B01D65/10, G01M3/40
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Membran mit Mitteln zur Zustandüberwachung[2014/44]
English:Membrane with means for status monitoring[2014/44]
French:Membrane dotée de moyens de surveillance d'état[2014/44]
Examination procedure29.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
07.01.2016Request for decision received: Request for further processing
20.01.2016Result of request for decision (Request for further processing): Request accepted
06.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2019Fee for grant paid
26.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10722305.9  / EP2435169
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[IA]WO2005105276  (FRIESLAND BRANDS BV [NL], et al) [I] 1,3-5,7,10,11 * page 8, line 1 - line 12; figure - * * page 14, line 8 - page 16, line 15 * * page 22, line 19 - page 24, line 8 * [A] 9;
 [A]DE19926372  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP1441209  (VARIAN SPA [IT]) [A] 1,6-9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0023] - [0028]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6541676  (FRANZ ALEKSANDER J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,9 * column 7, line 63 - line 67; figures 3a,3b * * column 10, line 24 - line 36 *;
 [X]WO2009033226  (INPHAZE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 27; figures 1,3; claims 33,34 *
ExaminationUS3278881
by applicantDE102004030380