EP2827142 - Ultrasonic inspection system for non-planar surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | ||
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Georgeson, Gary Ernest c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
Tapia, William Joseph c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
Serrill, Justin D c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/36] |
Former [2015/04] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14176410.0 | 09.07.2014 | [2015/04] | Priority number, date | US201313941884 | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US201313941884 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2827142 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2827142 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2827142 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/22, G01N29/26, G01N29/265 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G01N29/043 (EP,US);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | Ultraschallprüfsystem für nichtplanare Oberflächen | [2015/04] | English: | Ultrasonic inspection system for non-planar surfaces | [2015/04] | French: | Système d'inspection ultraacoustique pour des surfaces non planes | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006162456 (KENNEDY JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1830185 (INTELLIGENDT SYS & SERV GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2010095775 (SARR DENNIS P [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004093949 |