Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798956

EP2798956 - Methods and compositions for hematopoeitic stem cell self-renewal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2015  [2015/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stowers Institute for Medical Research
1000 E. 50th Street
Kansas City, MO 64110 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Perry, John, M
20736 W. 121st St.
Olathe, KS 66061 / US
02 / Li, Linheng
1000 West 66th Terrace
Kansas City, MO 64113 / US
03 / Grindley, Justin C.
24 Demarest Avenue
Closter, NJ 07624 / US
 [2014/51]
Former [2014/45]01 / Perry, John, M
20736 W. 121st St.
Olathe, KS 66061 / US
02 / Li, Linheng
1000 West 66th Terrace
Kansas City, MO 64113 / US
03 / Grindley, Justin, C
3835 Harrison Blvd.
Kansas City, MO 64109 / US
Representative(s)Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14176535.423.04.2008
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateUS20070926065P23.04.2007         Original published format: US 926065 P
US20080066693P22.02.2008         Original published format: US 66693 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798956
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen für die Selbsterneuerung von haematopoetischen Stammzellen[2014/45]
English:Methods and compositions for hematopoeitic stem cell self-renewal[2014/45]
French:Procedes et compositions pour auto-renouvellement de cellules souches hematopoeitiques[2014/45]
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
07.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/47]
15.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/47]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08743210.0  / EP2148569
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XPI]  - J. M. PERRY ET AL, "Cooperation between both Wnt/ -catenin and PTEN/PI3K/Akt signaling promotes primitive hematopoietic stem cell self-renewal and expansion", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (20110902), vol. 25, no. 18, doi:10.1101/gad.17421911, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1928 - 1942, XP055141281 [XP] 1-17,19 * abstract * * page 1934 - page 1936 * [I] 18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.17421911
 [I]  - HE XI C ET AL, "BMP signaling inhibits intestinal stem cell self-renewal through suppression of Wnt-beta-catenin signaling", NATURE GENETICS, (200410), vol. 36, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/ng1430, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 1117 - 1121, XP002613404 [I] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG1430
    [ ] - HE XI C ET AL, "Supplementary Fig. 2: BMP signaling inhibits intestinal stem cell self-renewal through suppression of Wnt-beta-catenin signaling", NATURE GENETICS, vol. 36, no. 10, (200410), URL: http://www.nature.com/ng/journal/v36/n10/extref/ng1430-S2.pdf, (20101209), XP002615928 [ ] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1430
 [A]  - DEVINE S M ET AL, "Clinical application of hematopoietic progenitor cell expansion: current status and future prospects.", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION FEB 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12621458, (200302), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0268-3369, pages 241 - 252, XP002613405 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bmt.1703813
 [I]  - ZHANG JIWANG ET AL, "Bone morphogenetic protein signaling inhibits hair follicle anagen induction by restricting epithelial stem/progenitor cell activation and expansion", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (200612), vol. 24, no. 12, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 2826 - 2839, XP002613406 [I] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2005-0544
 [I]  - HE X C ET AL, "Cellular and molecular regulation of hematopoietic and intestinal stem cell behavior", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES 2005 US LNKD- DOI:10.1196/ANNALS.1334.005, (2005), vol. 1049, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 28 - 38, XP002613407 [I] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/annals.1334.005
 [I]  - HE XI C ET AL, "PTEN-deficient intestinal stem cells initiate intestinal polyposis", NATURE GENETICS, (200702), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 189 - 198, XP002613408 [I] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1928
 [A]  - STILES B ET AL, "PTENless means more", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040915), vol. 273, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.YDBIO.2004.06.008, ISSN 0012-1606, pages 175 - 184, XP004527846 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2004.06.008
 [A]  - ROSSI DERRICK J ET AL, "Pten, tumorigenesis, and stem cell self-renewal", CELL, (200604), vol. 125, no. 2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 229 - 231, XP002613409 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2006.04.006
 [A]  - SCHMID A C ET AL, "Bisperoxovanadium compounds are potent PTEN inhibitors", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040521), vol. 566, no. 1-3, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2004.03.102, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 35 - 38, XP004509318 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2004.03.102
 [AP]  - PERRY JOHN M ET AL, "Wnt/beta-catenin and Pten/Akt Signaling Interaction Drives Hematopoietic Stem Cell Self-Renewal and Leukemogenesis.", BLOOD, & 50TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN- SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06 -09, 2008, (200811), vol. 112, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page 498, XP009142195 [AP] 1-19 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2006027545
 WO2004048536
 US5958769
 US2007065447
 US2006275823
 WO9104753
 WO9010448
    - ZHANG, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 836 - 841
    - CALVI, L. M. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 841 - 846
    - KIEL, M. J. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 121, pages 1109 - 1121
    - ARAI, F. ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 118, pages 149 - 161
    - LI, L.; XIE, T., ANNU. REV. CELL. DEV. BIOL., (2005), vol. 21, pages 605 - 631
    - HEISSIG, B. ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 109, pages 625 - 637
    - STILES, B. ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (2004), vol. 273, pages 175 - 184
    - MUTTER, G. L., AM. J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 158, pages 1895 - 1898
    - SUZUKI, A. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2001), vol. 14, pages 523 - 534
    - GROSZER, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, pages 2186 - 2189
    - KIMURA, T. ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2003), vol. 130, pages 1691 - 1700
    - MAEHAMA T; DIXON JE, J BIOL CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 13375 - 13378
    - CROSS DA; ALESSI DR; COHEN P ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 378, pages 785 - 789
    - PERSAD S ET AL., J CELL BIOL., (2001), vol. 153, pages 1161 - 1174
    - SONG, G. ET AL., J. CELL. MOL. MED., (2005), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 59 - 71
    - LOPICCOLO, J. ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (2007), vol. 18, pages 861 - 874
    - CULLY, M. ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, pages 184 - 192
    - SARBASSOV, D.D. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 307, pages 1098 - 1101
    - DATTA, S.R. ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 91, pages 231 - 241
    - NICHOLSON, K.M. ET AL., CELL SIGNAL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 381 - 395
    - WU, H. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 3113 - 3122
    - BURGERING, B.M.T.; MEDEMA, R.H., J. LEUKOCYTE BIOL., (2003), vol. 73, pages 689 - 701
    - FUJITA, N. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 32, pages 28706 - 28713
    - DATTA, S.R. ET AL., GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2905 - 2927
    - CARDONE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 1318 - 1320
    - DONEPUDI, M.; GRUTTER, M.G., BIOPHYS. CHEM., (2002), pages 145 - 152
    - MAYO L.D.; DONNER D.B., PROC. NATL., ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 11598 - 11603
    - GOTTLIEB T.M. ET AL., OCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 1299 - 1303
    - OREN M., CELL DEATH DIFFER., (2003), vol. 10, pages 431 - 442
    - HAUPT, Y. ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 296 - 299
    - MOMAND, J. ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, pages 1237 - 1245
    - EI-DEIRY, W. S. ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 75, pages 817 - 825
    - TANG, Y.; ENG C., CANCER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 66, pages 736 - 742
    - LI A. ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2006), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 575 - 587
    - KIM, L.; KIMMEL, A.R., CURRENT DRUG TARGETS, (2006), vol. 7, pages 1411 - 1419
    - HAGEN, T ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., vol. 277, no. 26, pages 23330 - 23335
    - MOON, R.T. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 1644 - 1646
    - KATOH, M; KATOH, M., CANCER BIOL THER., (2006), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 1059 - 64
    - HARADA, N. ET AL., EMBO J, (1999), vol. 18, no. 21, pages 5931 - 42
    - YILMAZ, O.H. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, pages 475 - 82
    - ZHANG, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, no. 7092, pages 518 - 22
    - GOTHERT, J.R. ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, no. 7, pages 2724 - 2732
    - ZHANG, C.C. ET AL., NAT MED, (2006), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 240 - 5
    - ZHANG, C.C.; H.F. LODISH, BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, no. 11, pages 4314 - 20
    - MAUDE TESSIER; JAMES R. WOODGETT, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, no. 33, pages 23978 - 23989
    - HUI, L. ET AL., BRAIN RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 1052, no. 1, pages 1 - 9
    - KENNEY, A.M. ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 131, pages 217 - 228
    - CUI, QL ET AL., NEUROCHEM INT, (2006), vol. 48, pages 383 - 393
    - WEST, K. ET AL., J. CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2003), vol. 111, pages 81 - 90
    - NIKITENKO, LL ET AL., BRITISH J. CANCER, (2006), vol. 94, pages 1 - 7
    - WEN, H. ET AL., CELLULAR SIGNALING, (2003), vol. 15, pages 37 - 45
    - CUI QL; FOGLE E; ALMAZAN G, NEUROCHEM INT, (2006), vol. 48, pages 383 - 393
    - SONG ET AL., J. CELL. MOL. MED., (2005), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 59 - 71
    - FOSTER, D.A., CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 1 - 4
    - TEE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 37288 - 96
    - GILLEY, J. ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 162, no. 4, pages 613 - 622
    - S. HSU ET AL., MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1997), vol. 11, no. 12, pages 1858 - 1867
    - THORNBERRY, N.A.; LAZEBNIK, Y., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, pages 1312 - 1316
    - KOMAROV ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, no. 5434, pages 1733 - 1737
    - PIETRANCOSTA ET AL., DRUG DEV RES, (2005), vol. 65, pages 43 - 49
    - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO ET AL., CANCER RES., (20040415), vol. 64, no. 8, pages 2853 - 7
    - SARAGOVI ET AL., SCIENCE, (19910816), vol. 253, no. 5021, pages 792 - 5
    - CASSETT ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (20030718), vol. 307, no. 1, pages 198 - 205
    - FASSINA, IMMUNOMETHODS, (199410), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 121 - 9
    - STEIN; COHEN, CANCER RES., (1988), vol. 48, page 2659
    - VAN DER KROL ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 958
    - WU-PONG, BIOPHARM, (199411), pages 20 - 33
    - MUKHOPADHYAY; ROTH, CRIT. REV. IN ONCOGENESIS, (1996), vol. 7, pages 151 - 190
    - ELBASHIR, S. M. ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498
    - CAPLEN, N. J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 9742 - 9747
    - HARBORTH, J. ET AL., J CELL SCI., (2001), vol. 114, pages 4557 - 4565
    - MIMEAULT, M. ET AL., "Stem Cells: A Revolution in Therapeutics - Recent Advances in Stem Cell Biology and Their Therapeutic Applications in Regenerative Medicine and Cancer Therapies", CLIN PHARMACOL THER., (2007), vol. 82, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.clpt.6100301, pages 252 - 64, XP009126807

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.clpt.6100301
    - ZHANG, Q. ET AL., PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, no. 18, pages 7444 - 8
    - LIU, J. ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL., (2005), vol. 44, no. 13, pages 1987 - 90
    - R. PAI ET AL., MOL BIOL CELL, (2004), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 2156 - 63
    - Remington 's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO.
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO.
    - The National Formulary, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION
    - GOTHERT, J.R. ET AL., "In vivo fate-tracing studies using the Scl stem cell enhancer: embryonic hematopoietic stem cells significantly contribute to adult hematopoiesis.", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, no. 7, pages 2724 - 2732
    - AKASHI, K. ET AL., "A clonogenic common myeloid progenitor that gives rise to all myeloid lineages", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, no. 6774, doi:doi:10.1038/35004599, pages 193 - 7, XP002239809

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35004599
    - MISE-OMATA S ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2005), vol. 328, no. 4, pages 1034 - 42
 EP20080743210
 WO2008US05230