Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816422

EP2816422 - Image forming device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]Image forming device, toner cartridge, developer cartridge, and image bearing member cartridge
[2016/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi, 467-8561 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2016/48]For all designated states
BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
15-1, Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi, 467-8561 / JP
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Shougo
c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intellectual Property Dept.
No. 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8562 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Tsutomu
c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intellectual Property Dept.
No. 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8562 / JP
03 / Ishii, Masahiro
c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intellectual Property Dept.
No. 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8562 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date14176689.920.10.2005
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateJP2004031576829.10.2004         Original published format: JP 2004315768
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816422
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816422
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/18, G03G15/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung[2016/31]
English:Image forming device[2016/31]
French:Dispositif de formation d'image[2016/31]
Former [2014/52]Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung, Tonerkartusche, Entwicklerkartusche und bildtragende Elementkartusche
Former [2014/52]Image forming device, toner cartridge, developer cartridge, and image bearing member cartridge
Former [2014/52]Dispositif de formation d'image, cartouche de toner, cartouche de révélateur et cartouche d'élément de support d'image
Examination procedure18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
21.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.05.2016Fee for grant paid
30.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
11.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05795855.5  / EP1806634
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2018/29]
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004037592  (HIURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-14,18-20,22,23 * paragraph [0026] *;
 [XY]JPH0535002  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 22,23 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4,7-14,18-20;
 [Y]JPH0675440  (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 1-4,7-14,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH0635244  (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 3,4,7-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH0635321  (RICOH KK) [Y] 11 * the whole document *;
 [XY]JPH11272054  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 15,16,21 * the whole document * [Y] 17-20;
 [Y]EP1191409  (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2004021059  (CANON KK) [Y] 20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6463232  (KAWAI TACHIO [JP], et al) [A] 5,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US5369479  (TSUYUKI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 5,6 * abstract *
by applicantJPH04322260