blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2816422 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2816422



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 484
25.10.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.11.2016 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
11.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 66
11.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 66
04.07.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
30.05.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
30.05.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
30.05.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.01.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 66
21.01.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 66
14.12.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
18.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
18.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
18.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
18.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.12.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
25.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
13.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 7
11.07.2014 Description Search / examination 39
11.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 23
11.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
26.05.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41