blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2816422


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
27.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
18.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
11.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.10.2016 Change - applicant
28.10.2016 Change - applicant published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
11.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2016 Change - German title published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
01.07.2016 Change - English title published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
01.07.2016 Change - French title published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
01.06.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.06.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.01.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.12.2015 Change - classification published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Change - classification published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
15.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - request for examination published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
15.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid