Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823722

EP2823722 - Clothing systems having resistance properties [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.07.2016  [2016/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Titin Inc
6115 Polo Drive
Cumming GA 30040 / US
[2015/32]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Titin Inc
1155 Mount Vernon Highway
Suite 800
Atlanta, GA 30338 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Whaley, Patrick Gerald
6115 Polo Drive
CUMMING, 30040 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date14176723.611.07.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateUS20131394029412.07.2013         Original published format: US201313940294
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823722
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/00, A63B21/06, A63B21/065, A63B21/00
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA14.07.2015
ME14.07.2015
TitleGerman:Kleidungssystem mit Widerstandseigenschaften[2015/03]
English:Clothing systems having resistance properties[2015/03]
French:Systèmes de vêtement présentant des propriétés de résistance[2015/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
03.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/29]
15.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/29]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
03.09.2015Request for further processing filed
03.09.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.09.2015Decision despatched
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US5937441  (RAINES MARK T [US]) [XD] 1-3,7 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 58 * * column 4, lines 7-14 * * column 7, line 1 - line 3 * * column 10, line 26 - line 34 * [Y] 4-6,8-11;
 [Y]US2011302687  (WHALEY PATRICK GERALD [US]) [Y] 4-6,8 * paragraphs [0049] , [0051] , [0053]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO03041524  (REED JAMES [US]) [Y] 4-6,8-11 * figures 1-3 *;
 [XP]US2013298302  (WHALEY PATRICK GERALD [US]) [XP] 1-11 * paragraphs [0043] , [0047] *
by applicantUS5978964
 US5937441
 US5048125
 US4407497
 US5810699
 US5951446
 US5553322
 US6557176
 US5144694
 US6675391
 US3142485
 US5002268
 US5011137
 US5033116
 US6546560
 US7104932
 US20040755606