Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2826977

EP2826977 - DEVICE FOR AT LEAST PARTIALLY BLOCKING AN OPENING AND FORMING A SEAL IN THE OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/04]Device for at least partially blocking an opening and forming a seal in the opening
[2019/15]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lincoln Industrial Corporation
One Lincoln Way
St Louis
Missouri 63120 / US
[2015/33]
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Aktiebolaget SKF
41 550 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Allen, Mark
1436 S. 8th Street St.
St Louis, Missouri 63104 / US
02 / Sanders, Scott
614 Apple Jack Ct.
Arnold, Missouri 63010 / US
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Schonecke, Mitja , et al
SKF GmbH
Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12
97421 Schweinfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/04]Burö, Sven Peter , et al
Kelvinbaan 16
3439MT Nieuwegein / NL
Application number, filing date14177184.015.07.2014
[2015/04]
Priority number, dateUS20131394277916.07.2013         Original published format: US201313942779
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2826977
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2826977
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01P11/02, F16L55/132
[2015/22]
Former International [2015/04]F01P11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
Former [2015/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUMINDEST TEILWEISEN BLOCKIERUNG EINER ÖFFNUNG UND ZUR FORMUNG EINER DICHTUNG IN DER ÖFFNUNG[2019/15]
English:DEVICE FOR AT LEAST PARTIALLY BLOCKING AN OPENING AND FORMING A SEAL IN THE OPENING[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR BLOQUER AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT UNE OUVERTURE ET FORMANT UN JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DANS L'OUVERTURE[2019/15]
Former [2015/04]Vorrichtung zur zumindest teilweisen Blockierung einer Öffnung und zur Formung einer Dichtung in der Öffnung
Former [2015/04]Device for at least partially blocking an opening and forming a seal in the opening
Former [2015/04]Dispositif pour bloquer au moins partiellement une ouverture et formant un joint d'étanchéité dans l'ouverture
Examination procedure04.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
16.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3230146  (LEITENBERGER MESS UND REGELTEC [DE]) [X] 2-13 * page 6, lines 10-24 * * page 11, line 6 - page 14, line 25 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2011277875  (DESAKI STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 2,3,5,6 * figure - *;
 [X]US6152193  (KLAMM THOMAS L [US]) [X] 2,3,5,6 * figure - *;
 [X]GB2435078  (CHUAN JIING ENTPR CO LTD [TW]) [X] 2,3,5,6 * figure - *;
 [X]DE4031154  (STEWING KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 2,3,5,6 * figure - *;
 [A]US5337598  (RAB DENNIS [US]) [A] 2-12 * figure - *