Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829644

EP2829644 - Method for making a leather thread [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
03.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visiotex GmbH
Alter Holzhafen 15
23966 Wismar / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Visiotex GmbH
Wegenerstraße 13
89231 Neu-Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Roell, Friedrich
Am Markt 24
23966 Wismar / DE
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Graf Glück Kritzenberger
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date14177311.916.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateDE20131010779422.07.2013         Original published format: DE102013107794
[2015/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829644
Date:28.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:D02G3/36
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Lederfadens[2015/05]
English:Method for making a leather thread[2015/05]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un fil de cuir[2015/05]
Examination procedure28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
22.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201805   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAI]DE102005059010  (RECYTEX TEXTILAUFBEREITUNG GMB [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,12,13 * figures 1-3 * * claims 1,2,5,9 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0016] , [0019] , [0029] * [A] 4 [I] 3,5-8,10,11;
 [XAI]DE202004019139U  (RECYTEX TEXTILAUFBEREITUNG GMB [DE]) [X] 1,9,12,13 * figures 1-3 * * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0016] - [0017] - [0029] , [0032] - [0035]; claims 1,2 * [A] 4 [I] 2,5-8,10,11;
 [X]US1014623  (DRURY WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 13 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 1 *;
 [A]CN102182072  (CHINA LEATHER AND FOOTWEAR INDUSTRY RES INST) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101597865  (SHIYIN HAN [CN]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS52152545  (MOROOKA YOSHIHARU) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *