Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819464

EP2819464 - Managing transmit power for better frequency re-use in tv white space [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Abraham, Santosh, Paul
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
02 / Vermani, Sameer
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
03 / Sampath, Hemanth
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
04 / Shellhammer, Stephen, J.
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
05 / Tandra, Rahul
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad
Wagner & Geyer
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14177345.716.02.2012
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS201161443587P16.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161443587 P
US20121339745015.02.2012         Original published format: US201213397450
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819464
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/14, H04B7/12, H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04W52/32, H04W74/08, H04W52/04, H04W52/36
[2017/39]
Former International [2015/01]H04W52/08, H04W52/24, H04W52/36, H04W52/50, H04W74/08, H04L1/00, H04B7/12, H04L1/06, H04W52/04, H04W52/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Verwaltung der Übertragungsleistung für bessere Frequenzwiederverwendung bei TV-Whitespace[2015/01]
English:Managing transmit power for better frequency re-use in tv white space[2015/01]
French:Gestion de puissance de transmission pour une meilleure réutilisation de fréquence dans un espace blanc de télévision[2015/01]
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
30.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/30]
08.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/30]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12706165.3  / EP2676492
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  - VARVARIGOS E A ET AL, "The slow start power controlled MAC protocol for mobile ad hoc networks and its performance analysis", AD HOC NETWORKS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ADHOC.2008.10.001, ISSN 1570-8705, (20090801), pages 1136 - 1149, (20081015), XP026038013 [A] 1-15 * page 1136, paragraph 1 - page 1143, paragraph Ante penultimate paragraph of the left column *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.adhoc.2008.10.001
 [A]  - YONGHONG ZENG ET AL, "Worldwide Regulatory and Standardization Activities on Cognitive Radio", NEW FRONTIERS IN DYNAMIC SPECTRUM, 2010 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100406), ISBN 978-1-4244-5189-0, pages 1 - 9, XP031664828 [A] 1-15 * page 7, paragraph III.C.1 *
 [A]  - CHIN-SEAN SUM, "Modification on DFS and DCF procedure adapting to FCC rules in TVWSPart 2: Hidden Node", INTERNET CITATION, (20100227), pages 1 - 19, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/10/11-10-0253-00-00af-modification on-dfs-and-dcf-procedure-adapting-to-fcc-rules-in-tvws-part-2-hidden node.pdf, (20110527), XP007918747 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 13 *