Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793217

EP2793217 - Portable phone terminal, image display controlling method, program thereof, and program recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Uchikawa, Tatsuya
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP
02 / Hosokawa, Satoshi
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Betten & Resch
Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date14177444.825.03.2008
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateJP2007007827126.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007078271
JP2007027613324.10.2007         Original published format: JP 2007276133
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2793217
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2793217
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36, G09G3/34
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2014/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbares telefonendgerät, Bildanzeigesteuerungsverfahren, Programm dafür und Programmaufzeichnungsmedium[2014/43]
English:Portable phone terminal, image display controlling method, program thereof, and program recording medium[2014/43]
French:Terminal de téléphone portable, procédé de commande d'affichage d'image, son programme et support d'enregistrement de programme[2014/43]
Examination procedure24.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
09.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
18.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/38]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08722745.0  / EP2131350
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006262111  (KEROFSKY LOUIS J [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0026] , [0089] , [0139] - [0145] - [0177] , [0182] , [0206]; figures 16,17,23-28 *;
 [X]WO2007029420  (SHARP KK [JP]; YAMANE YASUKUNI; TAKAHASHI MASAYUKI; UEHARA KAZUHIRO) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 US2009167658  [ ] (YAMANE YASUKUNI [JP] ET AL) [ ] * paragraphs [0034] - [0050] - [0071] - [0077] - [0107]; figures 5-7 * * paragraphs [0092] , [0107]; figure 12 *;
 [I]US2006221260  (FUJINE TOSHIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007]; figures 1-21 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0070] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0162] - [0176] *;
 [I]US2004113906  (LEW STEPHEN D [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0024] - [0057]; figures 2-8 *;
 [A]EP1489853  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0015]; figures 2,3,10,11,13 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0042] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] *
 [X]  - CHANG N ET AL, "DLS: Dynamic Backlight Luminance Scaling of Liquid Crystal Display", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20040801), vol. 12, no. 8, ISSN 1063-8210, pages 837 - 846, XP011115530 [X] 1-8 * pages 839,841 * * page 843 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVLSI.2004.831472
by applicantJP2004126470