Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830162

EP2830162 - Electrical connector keying system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/05]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McKibben, John Louis
660 Blossom Hill Lane
Dallastown, PA Pennsylvania 17313 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/05]
Former [2015/05]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date14177785.421.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateUS201361857532P23.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361857532 P
US20141432540708.07.2014         Original published format: US201414325407
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830162
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830162
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R11/28, H01R13/641, H01R13/645, H01R13/642, H01R13/20, // H01R13/187, H01R13/46, H01R13/627
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kodiersystem für elektrische Verbinder[2015/05]
English:Electrical connector keying system[2015/05]
French:Système de détrompage pour connecteur électrique[2015/05]
Examination procedure28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
25.02.2016Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
31.03.2016Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
20.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2017Fee for grant paid
18.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU21.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP0093628  (LOZANO RICO SANTIAGO) [X] 1,4,7-10 * page 10 - page 11; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,6,11 [I] 2;
 [Y]FR2941819  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 3 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US6183904  (KUBOSHIMA HIDEHIKO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 5,6,11 * column 11 - column 13; figures 13-15 *
ExaminationUS2011217885
 EP2584657
 EP1587180