Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830104

EP2830104 - GaN based led epitaxial structure and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]Gan based led epitaxial structure and method for manufacturing the same
[2015/14]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujian Institute Of Research On The Structure Of Matter, Chinese Academy Of Sciences
No. 155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou, Fujian 350002 / CN
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Cao, Yongge
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
02 / Liu, Zhuguang
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
03 / Deng, Zhonghua
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
04 / Chen, Jian
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
05 / Li, Junting
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
06 / Fei, Binjie
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
07 / Guo, Wang
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
08 / Tang, Fei
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
09 / Huang, Qiufeng
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
10 / Yuan, Xuanyi
155 Yangqiao West Road
Fuzhou
350002 Fujian / CN
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14177819.121.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateCN20131030732122.07.2013         Original published format: CN201310307321
CN20141029943027.06.2014         Original published format: CN201410299430
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830104
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/00, H01L33/08, // H01L33/50
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Epitaxische LED-Struktur auf GaN-Basis und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2015/05]
English:GaN based led epitaxial structure and method for manufacturing the same[2015/14]
French:Structure épitaxiale DEL à base GaN et son procédé de fabrication[2015/14]
Former [2015/05]Gan based led epitaxial structure and method for manufacturing the same
Former [2015/05]Structure épitaxiale DEL à base GAN et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
03.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1811580  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0033]; figure 1 * [A] 3-5,11;
 [XA]EP2405498  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]; RIKEN [JP] UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0056] - [0065]; figure 1 * [A] 3-5,11;
 [IA]EP2557607  (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [I] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0028] - [0030] - [0038] - [0042] * [A] 6-8,12-15;
 [A]WO2012106282  (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]; KUNDALIYA DARSHAN [US]; SCOTCH ADAM M [US]; R) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0024] *
by applicantUS5998925