Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796392

EP2796392 - Bend segment and method for manufacturing a bend segment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rexnord Flattop Europe S.r.l.
Via Dell'Industria 4
42015 Correggio (RE) / IT
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Andreoli, Andrea
via Quattro Ville 251/1
41123 Modena (MO) / IT
02 / Coen, Daniele
Via Orsi 9
42020 Albinea (RE) / IT
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14177893.616.06.2010
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateIT2009MI0105716.06.2009         Original published format: IT MI20091057
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796392
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G21/16, B65G21/22
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:Biegungssegment und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2014/44]
English:Bend segment and method for manufacturing a bend segment[2014/44]
French:Segment de coude et procédé de fabrication d'un segment de coude[2014/44]
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/24]
01.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/24]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10725689.3  / EP2443053
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0000415  (MCC NEDERLAND [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-16 * page 6, line 16 - page 6, line 23; figure 3 * [Y] 4,5,17,18;
 [Y]WO2006133370  (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,17,18 * page 1, lines 14-27; claim 11 *;
 [A]EP1148003  (FLEXON SYSTEMPLAST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0018]; figure 7 *;
 [A]DE8901563U  (LANGHANS GERARD) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0325333  (REGINA SUD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0790197  (MCC NEDERLAND [NL]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0790197
 DE8901563U