blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2796392 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2796392



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
24.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
01.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.11.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
01.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
05.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
01.09.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
07.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
07.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
07.08.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
21.07.2014 Description Search / examination 13
21.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
21.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
14.01.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32