blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2796392


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
31.01.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.08.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.10.2015 Change - representative
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
28.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
24.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid