Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829303

EP2829303 - Compositions comprising extract of malva neglecta and method of treating a skin condition with malva neglecta [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.07.2017  [2017/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Southall, Michael D.
7 Walking Purchase Drive
Pennington, NJ New Jersey 08534 / US
02 / Mahmood, Khalid
23 Pheasant Run
South Hadley, MA Massachusetts 01075 / US
03 / Pappas, Apostolos
311 Bellis Court
Bridgewater, NJ New Jersey 08807 / US
04 / Hu, Yaping
122 12th Street
Somerset, NJ New Jersey 08873 / US
05 / Reynertson, Kurt
42 Model Avenue
Hopewell, NJ New Jersey 08525 / US
06 / Chon, Suhyoun
12319 Winterberry Way
Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08540 / US
07 / Parsa, Ramine
5 Dumont Court
Lawrenceville, NJ New Jersey 08648 / US
08 / Randhawa, Manpreet
14 Hampshire Drive
Plainsboro, NJ New Jersey 08536 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date14177903.321.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateUS20131394748922.07.2013         Original published format: US201313947489
US20131394747322.07.2013         Original published format: US201313947473
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829303
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61Q19/00, A61K8/97, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/08
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen mit Extrakten aus Malva neglecta und Verfahren zur Behandlung der Haut mit Malva neglecta[2015/05]
English:Compositions comprising extract of malva neglecta and method of treating a skin condition with malva neglecta[2015/05]
French:Compositions comprenant un extrait de neglecta de malva et procédé de traitement d'une affection cutanée avec du neglecta de malva[2015/05]
Examination procedure23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
12.06.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010098751  (DUMAS MARC [FR] ET AL) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 19] , [0 27] - [0031] - [0 47] , [0 69] * * claims 1-5, 18, 20 *;
 [Y]JP2012219091  (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 66] - [0079] *;
 [Y]FR2814070  (SILAB SA [FR]) [Y] 1-18 * page 1 - page 2, line 23 * * page 6, line 28 - page 9, line 10 * * claim - *;
 [Y]US2006088615  (SEIBERG MIRI [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 14] , [0 22] , [0 26] , [0 48] - [0049] - [0 51] , [0 53] - [0054] - [0 65] * * claims 1-2, 5-10, 13-18 *;
 [A]US5643899  (ELIAS PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 50 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 21 *;
 [A]FR2790669  (VESTRI MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SYLVIA VOGL ET AL, "Ethnopharmacological in vitro studies on Austria's folk medicine-An unexplored lore in vitro anti-inflammatory activities of 71 Austrian traditional herbal drugs", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (20130601), doi:10.1016/j.jep.2013.06.007, ISSN 0378-8741, XP055074668 [X] 1-18 * abstract * * tables 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2013.06.007
 [Y]  - Springhill Suites, "Plants For A Future, Malva neglecta-Wallr.", (20121231), URL: http://pdfcrowd.com/url_to_pdf/?width=210mm&height=297mm, (20141010), XP055145619 [Y] 1-18 * "Medicinal Uses" *
by applicantUS7442391
 US7473435
 US7537791
 US2007196523
 US2005226834
 US2009241242
 US2006141014
    - S. FOSTER; JA DUKE, Medicinal Plants and Herbs, HOUGHTON MIFFLIN COMPANY, (2000), pages 170 - 171
    - "The Hamlyn Guide to Edible & Medicinal Plants", E. LAUNERT; D. BOWN, New Encyclopedia of Herbs and Their Uses, DK PUBLISHING, INC., (2001), page 50
    - ROGERS J; HARDING C; MAYO A; BANKS J; RAWLINGS A, "Stratum corneum lipids: the effect of ageing and the seasons", ARCH DERMATOL RES, (199611), vol. 288, no. 12, pages 765 - 70
    - JENSEN JM; FORL M; WINOTO-MORBACH S; SEITE S; SCHUNCK M; PROKSCH E; SCHUTZE S., "Acid and neutral sphingomyelinase, ceramide synthase, and acid ceramidase activities in cutaneous aging", EXP DERMATOL EXP DERMATOL., (200508), vol. 14, no. 8, pages 609 - 18
    - TZELLOS T. G.; KLAGAS I.; VAHTSEVANOS K.; TRIARIDIS S.; PRINTZA A.; KYRGIDIS A.; KARAKIULAKIS G.; ZOUBOULIS C. C.; PAPAKONSTANTINO, "Extrinsic Aging in the Human Skin Is Associated With Alterations in the Expression of Hyaluronic Acid and Its Metabolizing Enzymes", EXPERIMENTAL DERMATOLOGY, (2009), vol. 18, no. 12
    - SIDGWICK G.P.; INGBAL SA.; BAYAT A., "Altered Expression of Hyaluronan Synthase and Hyaluronidase MRNA May Affect Hyaluronic Acid Distribution in Keloid Disease Compared with Normal Skin", EXPERIMENTAL DERMATOLOGY, (2013), vol. 22, no. 5
    - "The Aged Epidermal Permeability Barrier. Structural, Functional, And Lipid Biochemical Abnormalities In Humans And A Senescent Murine Model", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 95, no. 5, pages 2281 - 2290
    - "Terminal Differentiation Of Facial Epidermis Of The Aged: Immunohistochemical Studies", DERMATOLOGY, (1994), vol. 188, no. 1, pages 21 - 24
    - GHERSETICH I; LOTTI T; CAMPANILE G; GRAPPONE C; DINI G., "Hyaluronic acid in cutaneous intrinsic aging", INT J DERMATOL, (1994), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 119 - 122
    - SOLANO ET AL., PIGMENT CELL RES., vol. 19, pages 550 - 571
    - ANDO ET AL., INT J MOL SCI, vol. 11, pages 2566 - 2575
    - G ZOCCHI, "Chapter 35 (Skin Feel Agents,)", G ZOCCHI, A. BAREL, M. PAYE AND H. MAIBACH, Handbook of Cosmetic Science and Technology, MARCEL DEKKER, INC, (2001), pages 399 - 415
    - L. OLDENHOVE DE GUERTECHIN, "Chapter 37(Classification of surfactants,)", L. OLDENHOVE DE GUERTECHIN, A. BAREL, M. PAYE AND H. MAIBACH,, Handbook of Cosmetic Science and Technology, MARCEL DEKKER, INC, (2001), pages 431 - 450
    - GLEASON; CRONQUIST, Manual of Vascular Plants, D VAN NOSTRAND COMPANY, pages 462 - 463