Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829731

EP2829731 - Gear pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2016/37]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ebihara, Tsuyoshi
c/o JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP
02 / Morita, Teppei
c/o JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP
03 / Udo, Katsuhisa
c/o JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date14177941.322.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateJP2013015369924.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013153699
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829731
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829731
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F04C2/10, F04C15/00, F04C2/08
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:Zahnradpumpe[2015/05]
English:Gear pump[2015/05]
French:Pompe à engrenages[2015/05]
Examination procedure02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/11]
22.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2016Fee for grant paid
26.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2014
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/47]AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/52]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006136014  (STT TECHNOLOGIES INC A JOINT V [CA]; CHANG PETER LIT MING [CA]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 3-6 * * claims 1-4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]JP2010096011  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC SINTERED ALY) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] *;
 [Y]US3995978  (KHAN FAROOQ A ET AL) [Y] 3,4 * figure 3 *
by applicantJP2005076542