Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813190

EP2813190 - Vertebral facet joint drill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spinal Elements, Inc.
2744 Loker Avenue West Suite 100 Carlsbad
California 92010 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Blain, Jason
3875 Copper Crest Rd
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
02 / Kovach, Eric J.
3107 Quebrada Circle
Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/51]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date14177951.221.02.2008
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateUS20070891159P22.02.2007         Original published format: US 891159 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813190
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813190
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/16
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bohrer für das Fazettengelenk des Wirbels[2014/51]
English:Vertebral facet joint drill[2014/51]
French:Perceuse pour l'articulation facettaire vertébrale[2014/51]
Examination procedure17.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
17.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2017Fee for grant paid
14.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08730413.5  / EP2129304
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/25]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002040227  (HARARI BOAZ [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-3,6-8,10,11 * figures 1A-4B *;
 [A]US4941466  (ROMANO JACK W [US]) [A] 1,3,6-8,10,11 * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 16; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2002173800  (DREYFUSS PETER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-3,8 * figures 1A-B *
by applicantUS5700265
 US6419678
 US6607530
    - KING ET AL., "Mechanism of Spinal Injury Due to Caudocephalad Acceleration", ORTHOP. CLIN. NORTH AM., (1975), vol. 6, page 19