Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829813

EP2829813 - Air conditioner and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
LG Twin Towers
20 Yeouido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2019/02]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Song, Yujin
c/o LG Electronics Inc. Changwon1 plant. 170
Sungsan paechong-ro
Sungsan-gu
Changwon-si
Gyeongsangnam-do 642-711 / KR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2015/05]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14177952.022.07.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateKR2013008630322.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130086303
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829813
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829813
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/41, H02J13/00, F24F11/30
[2018/35]
Former International [2015/05]F24F11/00, H02J13/00, H04N21/41
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klimaanlage und Steuerverfahren dafür[2015/05]
English:Air conditioner and method of controlling the same[2015/05]
French:Climatiseur et procédé de commande correspondant[2015/05]
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
06.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002029096  (TAKAI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0048] * * figure - *;
 [X]EP2093510  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0065] * * figure - *;
 [X]EP2056032  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0041] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1335166  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0088] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP2455677  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *