Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2829813 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2829813



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 384
21.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 82
16.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 82
24.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
24.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.09.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
21.09.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
06.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
06.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
21.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
11.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
13.10.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
21.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
22.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
22.07.2014 Description Search / examination 38
22.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 37
22.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4