Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807995

EP2807995 - Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbant articles using such webs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Yann-Per
Winton Hill Business Center
6083 Center Hill Ave
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45224 / US
02 / Fereshtehkhou, Saeed
Becket Ridge Technical Center
8611 Becket Road
West Chester, OH Ohio 45069 / US
03 / Stone, Keith Joseph
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnitati, OH Ohio 45202 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Dept.
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date14178002.306.04.2001
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateUS2000054488607.04.2000         Original published format: US 544886
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807995
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/512, A61F13/511, B26F1/10, B26F1/24, B26F1/26, B32B3/10, A61F13/513
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mit Öffnungen versehene Polymerfilmbahnen und absorbierende Artikel mit solchen Bahnen[2014/49]
English:Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbant articles using such webs[2014/49]
French:Bandes de film polymère à ouvertures et articles absorbants utilisant de telles bandes[2014/49]
Examination procedure26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
03.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01930453.4  / EP1267780
EP05110224.2  / EP1621169
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4327730  (SORENSEN EUGENE R) [X] 1-5,7-15 * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 4, line 1 - line 3 * * column 5, line 35 - line 40 * * column 6, line 11 - line 15 * * claim 1 * [A] 6;
 [X]US5997986  (TURI MORDECHAI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * figures 1-28 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11,23-28 *;
 [X]US4637819  (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * example 1 * * figures 1-7 * * claims 23,25 *;
 [X]WO9930658  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * page 7, lines 1-30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * page 16, line 18 - page 19, line 27 * * figures 1-16 * * page 20, lines 14-27 *;
 [XD]US6025049  (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figure 2; claims 1-5 *;
 [XD]US4629643  (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figure 7 * * column 11, line 28 - column 12, line 41 *;
 [XD]US4609518  (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figures 1-19 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]US5733628  (PELKIE JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 2, lines 30-55 * * claims 1-3,11 *
by applicantUS4342314
 US4463045
 US4629643
 US4609518
 US3929135
 US4324246
 US5006394
 US4152387
 US4197069
 US4533308
 US4637819
 US4681793
 US4695422
 US4778644
 US4839216
 US4846821
 US4798604
 US4780352
 US3566726
 US4634440
 WO9740793
 EP0525676
 EP0862904
 EP0858792
 JPH08260329
 JPH10131014
 US5916661
 US5628097
 WO9842289
 WO9836721
 EP0861646
 US5269981
 US3967623
 WO9906623
 US5670110
 WO9731601
 US5879494
 US5355579
 US5567736
 US5770144
 US4107364
 US4834741
 US5167897
 US5156793
 US5143679
 US5518801
    - "Penetration of Fabrics", EMERY I. VALKO, Chem. Aftertreat. Text., (1971), pages 83 - 113
    - Modern Plastics Encyclopedia Handbook, (1994), page 236
 US19990344161