Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809056

EP2809056 - Mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/52]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Jaichul
Chowon Daewon Apt. 306-1205, Pyeongan-Dong
Dongan-Gu, Anyang
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
02 / Cha, Ilgu
Samsung Tower Palace D-1109, Dogok 2-Dong
Gangnam-Gu
Seoul / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/52]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/49]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14178550.110.01.2013
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2012007187202.07.2012         Original published format: KR 20120071872
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809056
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2809056
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809056
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/23, H04M1/725, G06F1/16, // H04M1/02
[2015/14]
Former International [2014/49]H04M1/725, H04M1/23, // H04M1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät[2014/49]
English:Mobile terminal[2014/49]
French:Terminal mobile[2014/49]
Examination procedure08.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
22.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2017Fee for grant paid
10.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13150866.5  / EP2683140
Divisional application(s)EP17200846.8  / EP3297263
EP19157168.6  / EP3515051
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
IE10.01.2018
LU10.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2019/09]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
IE10.01.2018
LU10.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
LU10.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/50]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
LU10.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/47]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
LU10.01.2018
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/44]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2008090618  (LIM SEONG JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0054] * [A] 6,7;
 [IA]US2009323262  (ARITA SHIRO [JP]) [I] 1,2,4-7,10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0013] * * figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0118] * [A] 3,8,9;
 [IA]EP1387554  (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0048] * * figures 1-12 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0147] * [A] 9;
 [IA]US2008172634  (CHOI KYOO-SUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0013] * * figures 1-16 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0076] * [A] 3
ExaminationUS2010110010
 US2010299634