Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802093

EP2802093 - Methods and systems for channelization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Vrzic, Sophie
169 Thornbury Crescent
Nepean, ON K2G 6C2 / CA
02 / Yu, Dong-Sheng
31 Westpointe Crescent
Ottawa, ON K2G 5Y9 / CA
03 / Fong, Mo-Han
95 Beech Street Apt.205
Ottawa, ON K1S 3J7 / CA
 [2017/51]
Former [2014/46]01 / Vrzic, Sophie
169 Thornbury Crescent
Nepan, ON K2G 6C2 / CA
02 / Yu, Dong-Sheng
31 Westpointe Crescent
Ottawa, ON K2G 5Y9 / CA
03 / Fong, Mo-Han
95 Beech Street Apt.205
Ottawa, ON K1S 3J7 / CA
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date14178873.707.11.2008
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateUS20070986166P07.11.2007         Original published format: US 986166 P
US20080033631P04.03.2008         Original published format: US 33631 P
[2017/46]
Former [2014/46]US20070986166P07.11.2007
US2008003363104.03.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802093
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802093
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04B14/08, H04J11/00, H04W72/04, H04L5/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme zur Kanalführung[2014/46]
English:Methods and systems for channelization[2014/46]
French:Procédés et systèmes de découpage en canaux[2014/46]
Examination procedure29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2017Fee for grant paid
28.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08848157.7  / EP2223447
Divisional application(s)EP17194931.6  / EP3282602
Opposition(s)21.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/13]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
NO20.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1850547  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 7-10 *;
 [A]US2005157670  (TANG CLIVE K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 2, 3 *
 [IA]  - "R03-WP8F-C-1079!R1!MSW-E ; R03-WP8F-C-1079!R1!MSW-E", IEEE DRAFT; R03-WP8F-C-1079!R1!MSW-E, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20070214), vol. 802.18, pages 1 - 87, XP017644840 [I] 1-6,8-15 * Sect. 1.3 * * figures 6-10 * [A] 7
 [A]  - Qos Handoff, "White Paper Mobile WiMax From OFDM-256 to S-OFDMA Software solutions in radiocommunications", (20070101), URL: http://www.atdi.com/pdf/WP_mobile_WiMAX_ICStelecom.pdf, (20140929), XP055143380 [A] 1-15 * Sect. 3.2 * * Sect. 4.2 *
 [A]  - PHILIPS, "Resource-Block Mapping of Distributed Transmissions in E-UTRA Downlink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-071399, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070403), vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Julian; 20070403, XP050105342 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANDREAS FERNEKEB ET AL, "Performance of IEEE 802.16e OFDMA in Tight Reuse Scenarios", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS. PIMRC, IEEE; PI, XX, (20070901), doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2007.4394527, ISBN 978-1-4244-1143-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031168416 [A] 1-15 * Sect.s I, II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2007.4394527
 [A]  - "Part 16: Air Interface for Fixed and Mobile Broadband Wireless Access Systems Amendment for Physical and Medium Access Control Layers for Combined Fixed and Mobile Operation in Licensed Bands ; 80216e_2005DraftA", IEEE DRAFT; 80216E_2005DRAFTA, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20060110), vol. 802.16, pages 1 - 830, XP017627497 [A] 1-15 * Sect.s 8.4.1-8.4.6 * * Sect. 8.4.9.4.2 *
by applicantUS20080202741
 WO2005CA00387