Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799107

EP2799107 - Unit dose breakable vial with integrated brush applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Slokovic, Lorens
1106 Lynwood Dr.
Cleburne, Texas 76033 / US
02 / Gremel, Julie L.
1 Via Lantana
Rancho Santa Margarita, California 92688 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14178907.317.02.2012
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateUS201161444308P18.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161444308 P
US201161539177P26.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161539177 P
US201161568254P08.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568254 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799107
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799107
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M35/00, A45D34/04
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Brechbare Einheitsdosisampulle mit integrierter Bürstenauftragsvorrichtung[2014/45]
English:Unit dose breakable vial with integrated brush applicator[2014/45]
French:Flacon cassable à dose unitaire avec applicateur pinceau intégré[2014/45]
Examination procedure03.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
10.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2016Fee for grant paid
30.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12705774.3  / EP2637731
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
MT17.02.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
MT17.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU17.02.2017
Former [2017/48]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008025897  (SOCOPLAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US6516947  (VAN DYKE DARRELL W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 15; figure - *;
 [A]US6039487  (KRISTIANSEN GORDON [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO02094367  (ROWE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 15; figure - *;
 [A]WO0184977  (DELVIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010209477  (BUTUNER ZUHAL [CA], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *