EP2859850 - Control panel for ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 3366, Hanseo-ro Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 250-870 / KR | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woo, Kyeong Gu 308-1806 Jugong Greenville Apt. Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ko, Jae Yong 923-204 Jugong Apt. Sanggye-dong Nowon-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 14179463.6 | 01.08.2014 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | KR20130121801 | 14.10.2013 Original published format: KR 20130121801 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859850 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, F16M11/04 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
G06F3/02 (KR);
A61B8/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/14 (US);
A61B8/465 (US);
F16M11/045 (EP,US);
F16M11/048 (EP,US);
F16M11/08 (EP,US);
F16M11/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bedienfeld für die Ultraschalldiagnosevorrichtung | [2015/16] | English: | Control panel for ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus | [2015/16] | French: | Panneau de commande pour appareil de diagnostic par ultrasons | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2327368 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2,7,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]JPH11253443 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,2,7,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-2, 5, 7 *; | [A]US2013027858 (NAKAJIMA SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4870954 (SATOH TOMOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 58 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]KR20090069853 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * |