Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2863351

EP2863351 - Methods and systems for ranking of human profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021
Maharashtra / IN
[2015/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Srivastava, Rajiv Radheyshyam
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
02 / Palshikar, Girish Keshav
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
03 / Patil, Sangameshwar Suryakant
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
04 / Dungarwal, Pragati Hiralal
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
05 / Sodani, Abhay
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
06 / Pawar, Sachin
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
07 / Bhat, Savita Suhas
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
08 / Hingmire, Swapnil Vishveshwar
Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54B
Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune
411 013 Maharashtra / IN
 [2015/17]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14179660.704.08.2014
[2015/17]
Priority number, dateIN2013MUM328018.10.2013         Original published format: IN 3280MU2013
[2017/16]
Former [2015/17]IN2013MUM328018.10.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863351
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10
[2015/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2015/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme zum Klassifizieren von menschlichen Profilen[2015/17]
English:Methods and systems for ranking of human profiles[2015/17]
French:Procédés et systèmes pour classer des profils d'origine humaine[2015/17]
Examination procedure30.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
13.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2019
26.06.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
29.01.2016Request for further processing filed
29.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
29.01.2016Request for further processing filed
29.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
29.01.2016Request for further processing filed
29.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.02.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2012150458  (BRIGHT SIX LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 8, line 17 * * page 10, line 9 - page 47, line 5 *;
 [I]US2003093322  (SCIUK DAVID N [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0579] *;
 [A]US2012078906  (ANAND PANKAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012150761  (ANANIAN JOHN ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *