blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2863351 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2863351



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 217
25.06.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.06.2019 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
27.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
27.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 7
27.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 8
27.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.05.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
07.05.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 12
15.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
01.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.08.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
04.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
13.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
29.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Request for further processing Search / examination 7
30.11.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Priority document Search / examination 29
04.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
04.08.2014 Description Search / examination 19
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
04.08.2014 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1