blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2863351


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.06.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
14.04.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.08.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.04.2017 First examination report
20.03.2017 Change - priority published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
01.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2016 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
05.02.2016 Change - designated states published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - request for examination published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
03.02.2016 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
03.02.2016 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
02.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
29.11.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.10.2015 Change - representative
21.04.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]